Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 16:45:26 (UTC).

ERIK GOODRICH VS ERIK VELIE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 ERIK GOODRICH filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ERIK VELIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2865

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOODRICH ERIK

Defendants

VELIE ERIK

VICTORY LAW GROUP LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLESSALA BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

4/5/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • Hearing08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erik Goodrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Erik Goodrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erik Goodrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erik Goodrich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PLESSALA BRIAN MARTIN