This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 06:14:46 (UTC).

ERIK BECERRA VS SERENITY TRANSPORTATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 ERIK BECERRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SERENITY TRANSPORTATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7385

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BECERRA ERIK

Defendants and Respondents

PRICE SAMUEL LE RON

DOES 1-20

SERENITY TRANSPORTATION INC.

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAPIRO ANDREW L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON ERIC LEE

PARTOS MICHAEL JONATHAN

HURLEY ALISON KATHLEEN

PARTOS MICHAEL J.

HURLEY ALISON

GABUCHIAN MARGARET J.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/3/2020: Order - ORDER ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ERIC ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

10/16/2020: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ERIC ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Answer

9/16/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, AND ALL MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DATES

8/5/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, AND ALL MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DATES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANGIE V. PHUNG, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

6/24/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANGIE V. PHUNG, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

7/6/2020: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION OF LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND PROPOSED ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION

7/9/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND PROPOSED ANSWER-IN-INTERVENTION

Association of Attorney

2/11/2020: Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney

2/11/2020: Association of Attorney

Case Management Statement

12/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

11/25/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/25/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/29/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

SUMMONS -

3/9/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

3/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • Hearing09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder (Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Samuel Le Ron Price (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (of Eric Anderson in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Samuel Le Ron Price (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Samuel Le Ron Price (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Samuel Le Ron Price (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Erik Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Erik Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Erik Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Erik Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erik Becerra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697385    Hearing Date: December 03, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

ERIK BECERRA,

Plaintiff,

v.

SERENITY TRANSPORTATION,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC697385

Hearing Date: December 3, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Counsel filed a motion to be relieved. Prior to the hearing, Defendant filed a notice of substitution of attorney. Therefore, the motion to be relieved is denied as moot. Counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 3, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC697385    Hearing Date: September 14, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

ERIK BACERRA,

Plaintiff,

v.

SERENITY TRANSPORTATION, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC697385

Hearing Date: September 14, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTIOn TO INTERVENE

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (“Liberty Mutual”) filed a motion to intervene. The parties have since filed a stipulation permitting Liberty Mutual to intervene. Therefore, the motion is granted, per the stipulation. Liberty Mutual shall file its answer-in-intervention within ten (10) days. Liberty Mutual shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: September 14, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court