This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 13:05:09 (UTC).

ERICK MEDINA VS SAMUEL ROMERO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 ERICK MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMUEL ROMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6355

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA ERICK

Defendants

ROMERO SAMUEL

K & S SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECHAVARRIA ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

FENG IRVING

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

PI General Order

11/13/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/21/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/21/2019: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/10/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

10/11/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Erick Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Samuel Romero (Defendant); K & S SERVICES INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Samuel Romero (Defendant); K & S SERVICES INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Erick Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Erick Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrew Echavarria (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrew Echavarria (Attorney); Erick Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Echavarria (Attorney); Erick Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less