This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 05:15:08 (UTC).

ERICK LUNA VS ALENJANDRO MEDINA QUINTERO

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 ERICK LUNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALENJANDRO MEDINA QUINTERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3400

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA ERICK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

QUINTERO ALENJANDRO MEDINA

Cross Defendant

CABALLERO ELIASIB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUSTKAM BABAK

Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/19/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

10/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

9/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/4/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

9/4/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Erick Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Alenjandro Medina Quintero (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Alenjandro Medina Quintero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Alenjandro Medina Quintero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alenjandro Medina Quintero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Alenjandro Medina Quintero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Erick Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erick Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erick Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erick Luna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUSTKAM BABAK