This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 14:33:06 (UTC).

ERICK LETRAS VS JESUS GUTIERREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 ERICK LETRAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6481

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETRAS ERICK

Defendants

GUTIERREZ JESUS

TORO ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYBERG GREGORY B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/21/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/3/2022: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ERICK LETRAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYBERG GREGORY B. ESQ.