This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 16:41:25 (UTC).

ERICK GEORGE VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 ERICK GEORGE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE ERICK

Defendant

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAHMANI KENAN

KACHINEH GHOMI SHOKA

SMAILI JIHAD

Defendant Attorney

RANDENBERG COREY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/2/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/10/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

2/9/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

4/5/2022: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/17/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • Hearing02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Erick George (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANDENBERG COREY JAMES