This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 02:23:55 (UTC).

ERICK AYALA VS SELIG PARKING, INC., A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 ERICK AYALA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SELIG PARKING, INC , A GEORGIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0431

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYALA ERICK

Defendant

SELIG PARKING INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/27/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • Hearing07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erick Ayala (Plaintiff); As to: SELIG PARKING, INC., a Georgia corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 02/16/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erick Ayala (Plaintiff); As to: SELIG PARKING, INC., a Georgia corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erick Ayala (Plaintiff); As to: SELIG PARKING, INC., a Georgia corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erick Ayala (Plaintiff); As to: SELIG PARKING, INC., a Georgia corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less