This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 03:31:11 (UTC).

ERICA STEINBERG, VS CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 ERICA STEINBERG, filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0099

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEINBERG ERICA

Defendant

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOGRA SHALINI

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

1/3/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/3/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/3/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/3/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/5/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/13/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/13/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Initial Status Conference Order

1/13/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/14/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

3/10/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

3/10/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/13/2023

3/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/13/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Removal scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDefendant Charter Communications, Inc.'s Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Erica Steinberg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/30/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erica Steinberg, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erica Steinberg, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erica Steinberg, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erica Steinberg, (Plaintiff); As to: Charter Communications, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less