This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 16:53:29 (UTC).

ERICA PRICE VS EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 ERICA PRICE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2111

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRICE ERICA

Defendant

EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOURMAND MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WOODARD JOAN CELESTE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AND PAGA COMPLAINT)

12/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION AND PAGA COMPLAINT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

10/30/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/1/2020: Status Conference Statement - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/14/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Summons - SUMMONS OF FIRST AMENDED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

7/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS OF FIRST AMENDED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

7/8/2020: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/7/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/2/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

7/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case - DEFENDANT EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

3/9/2020: Notice of Related Case - DEFENDANT EDS SERVICE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Notice of Appearance

3/9/2020: Notice of Appearance

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

3/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Filing of Consolidated Complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:10 PM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Consolidated Class Action and PAGA Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Filing of Consolidated Complaint) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Filing of Consolidated Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by EDS Service Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/27/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Erica Price (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Erica Price (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Erica Price (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDS Service Solutions, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURMAND MICHAEL