This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2022 at 02:32:00 (UTC).

ERICA JAIMES ET AL VS CHRISTOPHER FRASSO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 ERICA JAIMES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER FRASSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and STEPHEN M. MOLONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0000

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRUNO BENITO

JAIMES ERICA

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HERTLEIN GARY

AGOSTINI ASHLY

FRASSO ASHLY

URANGA JUANITA

FRASSO CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN JOSEPH DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

AMOR HANNAH AURORA

OSBORNE RYNE W

RUWE WILLIAM EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 09/25/2020

9/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 09/25/2020

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

9/18/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

9/18/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

8/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE FOR CLAIMAN...)

6/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE FOR CLAIMAN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/25/2020

3/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/25/2020

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

3/23/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

3/23/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION 728

3/23/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION 728

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

3/23/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

3/23/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

3/23/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Notice of Settlement

10/10/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

10/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/10/2019

10/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/10/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money into the Blocked Account) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...) of 09/25/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Erica Jaimes (Plaintiff); Erica Arvizu (Plaintiff); Jeorgina Arvizu (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Erica Jaimes (Plaintiff); Erica Arvizu (Plaintiff); Jeorgina Arvizu (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money into the Blocked Account) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Benito Bruno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****0000    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 28

Petitions to Approve Compromises of Pending Actions

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On July 26, 2017, Plaintiffs Erica Jaimes, Erica Arvizu, Jeorgina Arvizu, and Benito Burno (“Plaintiffs”) filed a complaint against Defendants Christopher Frasso, Ashly Agostini, Ashly Frasso, Juanita Uranga, and Gary Hertlein (“Defendants”).  The complaint alleges motor vehicle negligence for an incident that occurred on October 10, 2015.

On December 13, 2017, Defendants/Cross-Complainants Christopher Frasso and Ashly Frasso filed a cross-complaint against Defendants/Cross-Defendants Juanita Uranga and Gary Hertlein seeking indemnity, apportionment, and declaratory relief.

On February 7, 2019, Defendants/Cross-Defendants/Cross-Complainants Juanita Uranga and Gary Hertlein filed a cross-complaint against Defendant/Cross-Complainant/Cross-Defendant Christopher Frasso and Defendant/Cross-Defendant Ashly Agostini seeking indemnity and declaratory relief.

On March 23, 2020, Petitioner Erica Jaimes filed two petitions to approve compromises of pending actions for Plaintiffs Erica Arvizu and Jeorgina Arvizu.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is scheduled for August 26, 2020.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Petitioner Erica Jaimes (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve two petitions to approve compromises of pending actions for Plaintiffs Erica Arvizu and Jeorgina Arvizu (“Claimants”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimants are required to attend the hearing on the petitions.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimants’ attendance is not required due to Claimants’ age and the Settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petitions are properly approved.  All required documents and information have been filed with the Court.  Claimants are to each receive $6,500 gross settlements.  Defendant Christopher Frasso is to pay $5,000 of each of Claimants gross settlements.  Defendant Juanita Uranga is to pay $1,500 of each of Claimants gross settlements.  The Court finds these settlements to be reasonable considering Claimants merely sustained soft tissue injuries and have since recovered from these injuries.

The gross settlements are to be reduced by attorney’s fees and medical costs.  $1,625 of each of the gross settlements, or 25%, are to be paid to Petitioner’s attorney in attorney’s fees.  This amount is reasonable considering the amount of work performed in this action.  $800 of each of the gross settlements is to be paid to Petitioner’s attorney as a reimbursement for paid medical expenses.  The net settlements of $4,075 are to be deposited into insured accounts at Wells Fargo located at 8501 Wilshire Boulevard, Beverly Hills, California 90211.  Claimants’ respective net settlements are to be withdrawn only upon the authorization of the Court.

CONCLUSION

The petitions are APPROVED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMOR HANNAH A. ESQ.