This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 11:28:37 (UTC).

ERICA CAMPOS MENDEZ VS CAMINO REAL FOODS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 ERICA CAMPOS MENDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAMINO REAL FOODS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0472

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDEZ ERICA CAMPOS

Defendants

2R STAFFING LLC

CAMINO REAL FOODS INC.

PERSONNEL STAFFING GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSAME VICTOR

GOMEZ RONALD ZERMENO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT 2R STAFFING, LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/28/2023: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT 2R STAFFING, LLC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT PSG OLDCO, LLCS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/10/2023: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT PSG OLDCO, LLCS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/29/2023

3/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/29/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Initial Status Conference Order

1/3/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 01/03/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 01/03/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

1/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/27/2022: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDefendant 2R Staffing, LLC's Notice of Appearance; Filed by: 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ronald Zermeno Gomez (Attorney): Organization Name changed from KOREY RICHARDSON, LLP to Korey Richardson LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDefendant PSG Oldco, LLCs Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Personnel Staffing Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Summons; Filed by: Erica Campos Mendez (Plaintiff); As to: 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 03/22/2023; Service Cost: 159.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Continuing Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Continuing Initial Status Conference) of 03/29/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/07/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Erica Campos Mendez (Plaintiff); As to: 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/06/2023; Service Cost: 166.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stuart M. Rice in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erica Campos Mendez (Plaintiff); As to: Camino Real Foods, Inc. (Defendant); 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant); Personnel Staffing Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erica Campos Mendez (Plaintiff); As to: Camino Real Foods, Inc. (Defendant); 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant); Personnel Staffing Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erica Campos Mendez (Plaintiff); As to: Camino Real Foods, Inc. (Defendant); 2R Staffing, LLC (Defendant); Personnel Staffing Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less