Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 10:43:23 (UTC).

ERIC STITT, ET AL. VS JASMINE EMILY ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 ERIC STITT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JASMINE EMILY ALVARADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2915

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STITT APRILYN

STITT ERIC

Defendant

ALVARADO JASMINE EMILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIONNING ALEXANDRA ELENA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

12/11/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Hearing05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eric Stitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eric Stitt (Plaintiff); Aprilyn Stitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Stitt (Plaintiff); Aprilyn Stitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Stitt (Plaintiff); Aprilyn Stitt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHIONNING ALEXANDRA ELENA