This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2022 at 21:58:53 (UTC).

ERIC SMUCKLER VS PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 ERIC SMUCKLER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7713

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMUCKLER ERIC

Defendants

YUTUC DAVID R MD

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE

YI YOUNG SUN MD

SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC .

SILICON BEACH SURGERY CENTER INC .

Not Classified By Court

GARNER HEALTH LAW CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELS PHILIP

MICHELS PHILIP ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KELLY JOHN

GARNER CRAIG BOYD

TUCKER JEFFREY

GARNER CRAIG BOYD ESQ.

KELLY JOHN ESQ.

CREASON JAMES ANTHONY ESQ.

DIAMOND SCOTT RORY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

1/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling

11/10/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

11/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

8/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

6/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL

Notice of Settlement

5/13/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2021

Request for Dismissal

5/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/4/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES...(COVID-19)

5/5/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL-RELATED DATES...(COVID-19)

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2020: Notice of Ruling

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Young Sun Yi, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff); Young Sun Yi, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff); David R Yutuc,, MD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal after Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal after Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Smuckler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARNER HEALTH LAW CORPORATION A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SILICON BEACH SURGERY CENTER INC . is a litigant