This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2019 at 08:38:07 (UTC).

ERIC R NATHANSON VS BRUNO VINICIUS PEIXOTO COSTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 ERIC R NATHANSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRUNO VINICIUS PEIXOTO COSTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7109

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATHANSON ERIC R.

Defendants

COSTA BRUNO VINICIUS-PEIXOTO

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

RASIER-CA LLC

BOND ESQ. CANDICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WARD AUSTIN G.

TROTTER JAMES MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

LEON DIANA

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN ESQ.

BROWN KIMBERLY BATCHELLER

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/15/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE

8/9/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CONNOR J. STINSON

6/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CONNOR J. STINSON

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/24/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Separate Statement

6/24/2019: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

6/24/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN G. WARD

7/8/2019: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN G. WARD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; HEAR...)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; HEAR...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

6/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Separate Statement

6/10/2019: Separate Statement

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ERIC NATHANSON'S MINI BRIEF REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN G. WARD

6/10/2019: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ERIC NATHANSON'S MINI BRIEF REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; DECLARATION OF AUSTIN G. WARD

Substitution of Attorney

6/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE FURTHER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE FORM INTERROGATORY 3.7

5/29/2019: Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE FURTHER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE FORM INTERROGATORY 3.7

Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE FURTHER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE FORM INTERROGATORY 3.7

5/29/2019: Brief - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE FURTHER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE FORM INTERROGATORY 3.7

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION SPECIALLY SETTING MOTION TO C...)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION SPECIALLY SETTING MOTION TO C...)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Protective); Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (as to Protective Order) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (as to Protective Order) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (AS TO CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric R. Nathanson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TROTTER JAMES MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARD AUSTIN G.