This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2023 at 01:06:48 (UTC).

ERIC MORRIS VS SUN PHARMA GLOBAL INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 ERIC MORRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SUN PHARMA GLOBAL INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3228

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRIS ERIC

Defendants

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION A CORPORATION

CVS PHARMACY INC. A CORPORATION

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA INC A CORPORATION

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES INC. A CORPORATION

SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD A CORPORATION

SUN PHARMA GLOBAL INC. A CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKAPIK MARK JAMES

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/15/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

11/17/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/11/2021

1/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/11/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CASE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CASE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE CASE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

1/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE CASE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL OF STATE ACTION TO FEDERAL C...)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL OF STATE ACTION TO FEDERAL C...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STATUS OF REMOVAL OF STATE ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STATUS OF REMOVAL OF STATE ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2023

DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketNotice NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING STATUS OF REMOVAL OF STATE ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT; Filed by: Eric Morris (Plaintiff); As to: Sun Pharma Global Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketMinute Order (Conference Re: Status of Removal of State Action to Federal C...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021

DocketStatus Conference Re: Case removal to Federal Court scheduled for 08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to 08/17/2021; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketStatus Conference Re: Case removal to Federal Court scheduled for 08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Case removal to Federal Court)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2021

DocketOver the objection of plaintiff, Status Conference Re: Case removal to Federal Court scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08/17/2021 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2021

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2021

DocketNotice NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE CASE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Filed by: Eric Morris (Plaintiff); As to: CVS Pharmacy, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2021

DocketStatus Conference Re: Case removal to Federal Court scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/15/2020

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Morris (Plaintiff); As to: Sun Pharma Global Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Morris (Plaintiff); As to: Sun Pharma Global Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Morris (Plaintiff); As to: Sun Pharma Global Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less