*******4845
08/02/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
MOCH ERIC
RAMIREZ DAVID GUERRERO
BAER TRACY MITCHELL
LANE ANGELINA ROSE
8/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
8/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
8/2/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS
8/2/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE
8/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
8/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet
8/2/2022: Complaint
8/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service
10/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
10/5/2022: Answer
Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
[-] Read LessHearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant); As to: Eric Moch (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Eric Moch (Plaintiff); As to: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/06/2022; Service Cost: 99.31; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Moch (Plaintiff); As to: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Moch (Plaintiff); As to: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Moch (Plaintiff); As to: David Guerrero Ramirez (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28
[-] Read Less