This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 18:11:39 (UTC).

ERIC MALDONADO VS OSCAR WILLIE

Case Summary

On 12/15/2021 ERIC MALDONADO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR WILLIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5859

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALDONADO ERIC

Defendant

WILLIE OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASHEMI BOBBY RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

SETTLES STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/29/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

6/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

6/9/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/17/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

12/7/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/25/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/25/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/21/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2024
  • Hearing12/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • Hearing06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Bobby Richard Hashemi (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAddress for Bobby Richard Hashemi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Eric Maldonado (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Bobby Richard Hashemi (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Oscar Willie (Defendant); As to: Oscar Willie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Willie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Willie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Willie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Maldonado (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Willie (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******5859 Hearing Date: March 10, 2023 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ERIC MALDONADO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

OSCAR WILLIE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******5859

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 10, 2023

Plaintiff Eric Maldonado’s (“Plaintiff”) counsel of record, Joseph R Manning Jr. and Babak Hashemi (“Counsel”), seek to be relieved as counsel, contending there has been an irreparable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship to the point Counsel can no longer effectively represent Plaintiff in this matter. Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Plaintiff via mail at Plaintiff’s last known address. Counsel has filed proof of service on Plaintiff and on Defendant.

However, there are at least three issues that prevent the motion from being granted.

First, to the extent that Counsel’s motion indicates it was served on Plaintiff by electronic service, California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(d)(2) states: “If the notice is served on the client by electronic service under Code of Civil Procedure section 1010.6 and rule 2.251, it must be accompanied by a declaration stating that the electronic service address is the client's current electronic service address.” The Court cannot locate any such declaration with Counsel’s motion.

Second, Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Plaintiff at a confirmed address. Counsel declares he confirmed the address through certified mail, return receipt. Certified mail does not establish proof the address is confirmed unless there is a signed return receipt. (See Cal. Rules of court, rule 3.1362(d)(2).) No such signed return receipt was submitted with the motion.

Lastly, trial in this action is currently set for June 14, 2023, which is just over three months after the hearing on this motion. Unlike their clients, attorneys do not have an absolute right to withdraw from representation at any time with or without cause. Even where grounds for termination exist, attorneys seeking to withdraw must comply with the procedures set forth in California Rule of Professional Conduct (CRPC) 3.700 and are subject to discipline for failure to do so. CRPC 3.700(B) lists various grounds for mandatory withdrawal, none of which are asserted here.

An attorney's right to terminate the attorney-client relationship and withdraw from a case is not absolute. (See Vann v. Shilleh (1975) 54 Cal.App.3d 192, 197; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398.) The decision whether to grant or deny an application for withdrawal is within the court's discretion, and it does not abuse that discretion by denying the application on the ground that the attorney's withdrawal would work injustice upon a third party. (Hodcarriers, Bldg. and Common Laborers Local Union No. 89 v. Miller (1966) 243 Cal.App.2d 391; Heple v. Kluge (1951) 104 Cal.App.2d 461.)

The rules have been liberally construed to protect clients. (Vann v. Shilleh, supra, 54 Cal.App.3d 192; Chaleff v. Superior Court (1977) 69 Cal.App.3d 721; Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.) An attorney, either with the client's consent or court's approval, may withdraw from a case when withdrawal can be accomplished without undue prejudice to the client's interests; however, an attorney “shall not withdraw from employment until the member has taken reasonable steps to avoid reasonably foreseeable prejudice to the rights of the client, including giving due notice to the client, allowing time for employment of other counsel, complying with rule 3-700(D), and complying with applicable laws and rules.” (CRPC 3.700(A)(2).) A lawyer violates his or her ethical mandate by abandoning a client (Pineda v. State Bar (1989) 49 Cal.3d 753, 758 759), or by withdrawing at a critical point and thereby prejudicing the client’s case. (CRPC 3.700(A)(2); Vann v. Shilleh, supra.)

Given that trial is set for just over three months after this hearing, Plaintiff will be prejudiced if Counsel is permitted to withdraw. Absent a mandatory ground for relief, the motion is denied. The denial is without prejudice to Counsel re-filing the motion if the trial date is continued.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE:

Dated this 10th day of March 2023

Hon. Audra Mori

Judge of the Superior Court