This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 11:52:05 (UTC).

ERIC HICKMAN VS CITY OF TORRANCE

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 ERIC HICKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7386

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKMAN ERIC

Defendant

CITY OF TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAHMANI NICOLE

Defendant Attorney

STEPHAN PAUL E

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/29/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/22/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR:

3/23/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR:

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: DEMURRER-WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: DEMURRER-WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: DEMURRER-WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: DEMURRER-WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 03/23/2020

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/6/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/26/2019: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/15/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/18/2019: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF SIGNED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE); Filed by City of Torrance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Torrance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Torrance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by CITY OF TORRANCE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff); Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eric Hickman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHAN PAUL E.