This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 16:04:36 (UTC).

ERIC HERNANDEZ VS CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 ERIC HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CASTLE COOKE AVIATION SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2614

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ERIC

Defendant

CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASTEGAR FARZAD

Defendant Attorney

KAUFMAN THOMAS ROY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Appearance

5/17/2021: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 04/22/2021

4/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 04/22/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/06/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

7/2/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FROM AUGUST 30 TO SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 VIA E-MAIL

8/27/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FROM AUGUST 30 TO SEPTEMBER 10, 2021 VIA E-MAIL

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

8/23/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

8/23/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

9/24/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOrder (Authorizing Electronic Service (Case Anywhere)); Filed by Eric Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (from August 30 to September 10, 2021 via e-mail); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by Castle & Cooke Aviation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Class Action Response Statement; Filed by Eric Hernandez (Plaintiff); Castle & Cooke Aviation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Castle & Cooke Aviation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Eric Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:19 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 04/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASTLE & COOKE AVIATION SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASTEGAR FARZAD