Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/14/2020 at 21:53:04 (UTC).

ERIC GHAYAM VS J & H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 ERIC GHAYAM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against J H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0296

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHAYAM ERIC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

J & H ENGINEERING GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 500 INCLUSIVE

PG TRUCKING LLC

SKIN TRANSPORT

WILLIE TRUCKING INC.

ANIMAL TRUCKING

C&B TRUCKING INC.

J&H TRUCKING

RZ TRUCKING INC.

YVA TRUCKING

N.L. CRUZ INC.

Cross Plaintiff

J & H ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEHORAY MAC E.

NEHORAY SIAMAK EBRAHIM

Attorney at Nehoray & Drake, LLP

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 1030

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE DONNA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/23/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/22/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service

8/24/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

8/24/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

12/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION

11/7/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER, ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS], FILED ON 11-12-2019

11/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER, ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS], FILED ON 11-12-2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Cross-Complaint

6/20/2019: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

7/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT...)

5/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/16/2019

4/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/16/2019

Complaint

12/11/2018: Complaint

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • Hearing01/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to set Aside Entry of Default); Filed by WILLIAM A. HERNANDEZ DBA WILLIE TRUCKING Erroneously Sued As Willie Trucking Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to serve Roes on Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. Erroneously Sued As J & H Engineering Contractors, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and Sanctions in the Amount...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 04/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eric Ghayam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eric Ghayam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eric Ghayam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PG TRUCKING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where J & H Engineering General Contractors Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE DONNA