This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 03:06:29 (UTC).

ERIC DIESEL VS PREMIER HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 ERIC DIESEL filed an Other lawsuit against PREMIER HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD E. RICO and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8765

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD E. RICO

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIESEL ERIC

Defendants and Respondents

ROCKY

REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

TABULA ARSENIO

DOES ONE THROUGH 100

CRUZ EMANUEL TOMAS

PREMIER HOME HEALTH PROVIDERS INC.

SANTA CLARA VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

GAMBOA ELVIRA G.

EL CAMINO HOSPITAL

LALLANA ROQUE GATCHALIAN

ROYAL BELLINGHAM LUXURY AND ASSISTED

CRYSTAL SPRINGS CHIROPRACTIC

DOES ONE THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

MATT CRUZ

ROYAL BELLINGHAM LUXURY ASSISTED LIVING

DOES 1-100

LIVING ROYAL BELLINGHAM LUXURY ASSISTED

CRUZ MATT

CHIROPRACTIC CRYSTAL SPRINGS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/1/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/15/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

12/31/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/4/2019: Minute Order

Response

4/30/2019: Response

Minute Order

5/6/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

7/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

7/9/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/5/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/5/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

5/2/2018: RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/3/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

1/3/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Case Management Conference Statement; Filed by Eric Diesel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Response (to Order to Show Cause); Filed by Eric Diesel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Minute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Eric Diesel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2018
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 309; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be non-Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Eric Diesel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

:_?Z;‘:;:f ‘fi‘};{_} 3 _;‘:E.'}

Eric Diesel PO Box 19350

Stanford CA 94309

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF Los Angeles -- UNLIMITED JURISDICTION 111 North Hill St., Los Angeles, CA 90012

ERIC DIESEL, Case No.: BC688765 a natural person, Plaintiff,

VS. Response to Order to Show Premier Home Health Providers Inc., El Cause for Failure to file Proof Camino Hospital, Regional Medical Center, of Service of Summons and

Santa Clara Valley Medical Center, Elvira G. Complaint

Gamboa, Arsenio Tabula, Roque Gatchalian

Lallana aka Rocky, Emanuel Tomas Cruz aka| Hearing Date: 5-2-2018, Matt Cruz, Royal Bellingham Luxury and 8:30 am, Dept. 17 Assisted Living, Crystal Springs Chiropractic,

and DOES ONE THROUGH 100,

inclusive,

Defendants

1 2018.05.02 Diesel v Premier et al Case BC688765, Response to Order to Show Cause for Failure to file Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint