This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 05:12:55 (UTC).

ERENDIRA AMBRIZ VS TPS SOLUTIONS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 ERENDIRA AMBRIZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TPS SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0997

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMBRIZ ERENDIRA

Defendants and Respondents

TOLL GOLBAL FORWARDING SCS USA INC

TPS SOLUTIONS INC

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING AMERICAS INC

DOES 1 TO 20

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING USA INC

LANDEROS DIANA

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING AMERICAS INC.

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARQUEZ RICHARD T. ESQ.

KIM JAE HYUN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILSON NIKKI L. ESQ.

SAVIN MAITAL

WILSON NIKKI LEE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/28/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/2/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/12/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order

11/29/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Unknown

11/14/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

11/14/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

DEFENDANTS TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING (AMERICAS) INC., TOLL GLBOAL FORWARDING SCS (USA) INC., TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING (USA) INC.'S, DIANA LANDEROS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ERENDIRA AMBRIZ'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAIN

9/7/2017: DEFENDANTS TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING (AMERICAS) INC., TOLL GLBOAL FORWARDING SCS (USA) INC., TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING (USA) INC.'S, DIANA LANDEROS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ERENDIRA AMBRIZ'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAIN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/24/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/30/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/10/2017: Minute Order

SUMMONS

8/2/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

8/2/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 19; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 19; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by ERENDIRA AMBRIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ERENDIRA AMBRIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by ERENDIRA AMBRIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • at 3:20 PM in Department 69; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by ERENDIRA AMBRIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE SECTION 12940 ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ERENDIRA AMBRIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TPS SOLUTIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARQUEZ RICHARD