This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 09:41:11 (UTC).

ERENDIDA FLORES VS CAPLUGS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 ERENDIDA FLORES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAPLUGS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0490

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES ERENDIDA

Defendants

CAPLUGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

GUZMAN GERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EGHBALI BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ TROY A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2024
  • Hearing01/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2024
  • Hearing01/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference): Status Date changed from 01/06/2023 to 01/06/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference) to (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (time estimate for trial is 5-7 days) scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/05/2024 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); As to: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 08/04/2022; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); German Guzman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); German Guzman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erendida Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Caplugs, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); German Guzman (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less