This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 13:46:04 (UTC).

EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS CAMP CAKE, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMP CAKE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0813

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

CAMP CAKE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY D.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/10/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQR-FIELDERS CROSSING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY D.