This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 11:59:38 (UTC).

EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PATRICK INDUSTRIES, INC., AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRICK INDUSTRIES, INC , AN INDIANA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5184

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PATRICK INDUSTRIES INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ECOFF LAWRENCE CRAIG

ECOFF LAWRENCE C.

Defendant Attorney

RAHMANPOUR ROYA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

6/14/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Case Management Statement

6/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

3/10/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Cross-Complaint

3/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/9/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Patrick Industries, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE); Filed by Patrick Industries, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Patrick Industries, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Patrick Industries, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PATRICK INDUSTRIES INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHMANPOUR ROYA