This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:57:24 (UTC).

EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ESTATE OF ELIZER PANGILINAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ESTATE OF ELIZER PANGILINAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8456

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC.

Defendants

PANGILINAN ILUMINADA AKA LUMI R. PANGILINAN

PANGILINAN MARTIN

ESTATE OF ELIZER PANGILINAN

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ECOFF LAWRENCE C.

PHILLIPS BRENT R.

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSUM BLAKE J.

REYES JILLIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILINAN

12/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILINAN

Request for Judicial Notice

12/23/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONIC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILLINAN

12/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONIC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILLINAN

Answer

12/15/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/15/2021: Answer

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/21/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KRISTINA A FRETWELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO SEVER

10/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KRISTINA A FRETWELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO SEVER

Motion to Sever

10/21/2021: Motion to Sever

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

10/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' LUMI PANGILINAN AND MARTIN PANGILINAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO

11/4/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' LUMI PANGILINAN AND MARTIN PANGILINAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AND OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF O PPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER

11/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF O PPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER

11/10/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/18/2021: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO SEVER [RES. ...)

11/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO SEVER [RES. ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE]

11/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE]

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONICS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILINAN); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF EPSILON ELECTRONIC, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MARTIN PANGILLINAN); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Estate of Elizer Pangilinan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Martin Pangilinan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing Dates); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation to extend time for Defendants to ...) of 07/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (of CMC); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (proof of service); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Epsilon Electronics, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPSILON ELECTRONICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Security Insuance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSUM BLAKE J.