This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 11:09:21 (UTC).

EPPENGER, TENNIE VS DOE, JOHN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 EPPENGER, TENNIE filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against DOE, JOHN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0427

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EPPENGER TENNIE

Respondent

DOE JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAS DEV DEEP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/18/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/18/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Proof of Service - Served the CH-#109,110,100.

2/16/2021: Proof of Service - Served the CH-#109,110,100.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

1/27/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment (non-violence)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/27/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/27/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner ((Petitioner stipulates on the record to Commissioner Laura Cohen) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Served the CH-#109,110,100. ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment (violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less