Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:37:25 (UTC).

EPITACIO MACIEL VS ALBERTO ANDRES GARCIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by EPITACIO MACIEL against ALBERTO ANDRES GARCIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6044

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACIEL EPITACIO

Defendants

GARCIA ALBERTO ANDRES

GARCIA MARIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/5/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons

11/26/2018: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

11/26/2018: Unknown

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Epitacio Maciel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less