This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 13:07:53 (UTC).

EPIFANIO RAMOS VS FRONTLINE HRO, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 EPIFANIO RAMOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FRONTLINE HRO, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0927

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS EPIFANIO

Defendants

FRONTLINE HRO LLC

GOTWORX STAFFING INC.

STG LOGISTICS INC. DBA ST. GEORGE LOGISTICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

Defendant Attorneys

WATTLES KEVIN S.

DAVOUDIAN SHIVA

HARSHAW PAUL

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

5/17/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/5/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/22/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

3/3/2023: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/21/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

2/21/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/23/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2024
  • Hearing05/10/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: GotWorx Staffing, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Alternative Dispute Resolution scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (8 day estimate) scheduled for 05/20/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 04/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: STG Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Epifanio Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Frontline HRO, LLC (Defendant); GotWorx Staffing, Inc. (Defendant); STG Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Epifanio Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Frontline HRO, LLC (Defendant); GotWorx Staffing, Inc. (Defendant); STG Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Epifanio Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Frontline HRO, LLC (Defendant); GotWorx Staffing, Inc. (Defendant); STG Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less