This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2019 at 20:52:54 (UTC).

EPHRAM NEHME, ET AL VS. TERRA GROUP, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 EPHRAM NEHME filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TERRA GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6414

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NEHME EPHRAM AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME

NEHME ODETTE AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME

ODETTE NEHME AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME FAMILY TRUST

EPHRAM NEHME AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME FAMILY TRUST

Defendants and Cross Defendants

BARBEAU CLYDE L.

BARBEAU PATRICIA A.

DOES 1-10 INCLUSIVE

TERRA GROUP INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

BESPOKE COLLECTION INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

MAX E. STEINERT AND RANDALL G. STEINERT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES OF THE MARVIN E. STEINERT AND ADALA N. STEINERT LIVING TRUST OF 1978

INVESTMENT GRADE PROPERTIES INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

RELATED PROPERTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BARBEAU BRAD

ODETTE NEHME AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME FAMILY TRUST

EPHRAM NEHME AS TRUSTEE OF THE NEHME FAMILY TRUST

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MAX E. STEINERT AND RANDALL G. STEINERT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES OF THE MARVIN E. STEINERT AND ADALA N. STEINERT LIVING TRUST OF 1978

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IEZZA NICOLINO IRENIO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MONJE RICHARD ALAN

WERNER JOSEPH ALAN

SMITH THOMAS MARK

Cross Defendant Attorney

KELBLE GLENN

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/11/2019: Answer

Notice

6/4/2019: Notice

Legacy Document

11/6/2017: Legacy Document

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

11/13/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Legacy Document

1/5/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

1/5/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

Legacy Document

4/30/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

5/4/2018: Minute Order

Response

8/14/2018: Response

Minute Order

8/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/2/2018: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/3/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney

1/17/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Cross-Complaint

4/2/2019: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

4/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Ephram Nehme, individually and as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, individually and as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bespoke Collection, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Max E. Steinert and Randall G. Steinert, Successor Trustees of the Marvin E. Steinert and Adala N. Steinert Living Trust of 1978 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Max E. Steinert and Randall G. Steinert, Successor Trustees of the Marvin E. Steinert and Adala N. Steinert Living Trust of 1978 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Bespoke Collection, Inc., a Nevada corporation (Defendant); Brad Barbeau (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Max E. Steinert and Randall G. Steinert, Successor Trustees of the Marvin E. Steinert and Adala N. Steinert Living Trust of 1978 (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Terra Group, Inc., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Clyde L. Barbeau (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ephram Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff); Odette Nehme, as Trustee of the Nehme Family Trust, dated July 1, 1995 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Terra Group LLC is a litigant