This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:41:44 (UTC).

ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL INC VS CRAIG GIBSON

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CRAIG GIBSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9031

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL INC

ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL INC DBA SERVPRO OF E. FULLERTON//PLACENTIA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

SERVPRO OF E. FULLERTON/PLACENTIA

DOES 1 TO 25

GIBSON CRAIG

MASON JOEL RODNEY

JRM BUILDERS & DEVELOPMENT

ALLEN DELORES MARIE

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL INC DBA SERVPRO OF E. FULLERTON//PLACENTIA

SKELTON ROBERT C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KOORSTAD CHRISTOPHER J. ESQ.

KOORSTAD CHRISTOPHER JON ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL JOHN KEVIN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BERGER AARON

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS DELORES MARIE ALLEN, JOEL RODNEY MASON, AND JRM BUILDERS & DEVELOPMENT'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1/4/2018: DEFENDANTS DELORES MARIE ALLEN, JOEL RODNEY MASON, AND JRM BUILDERS & DEVELOPMENT'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

1/26/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/13/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - Declaration of John K. Mitchell

2/13/2019: Declaration - Declaration of John K. Mitchell

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 02/27/2019

Declaration - Declaration of John K. Mitchell in Response to Order to Show Cause

3/8/2019: Declaration - Declaration of John K. Mitchell in Response to Order to Show Cause

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2019

3/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

5/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO C...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/29/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO ENTER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Trial Brief

5/29/2019: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

2/1/2017: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

3/16/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC.

Minute Order -

6/12/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/14/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • Hearing03/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Enforcement of Stipulation Re Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (Enforcement of Stipulation Re Settlement); Filed by Envirotech Environmental, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Craig Gibson (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Envirotech Environmental, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Envirotech Environmental, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Jury Trial ((2 to 4 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONSTRUCTION CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint (for: (1) Breach of Written Contract; (2) Fraud (2 Counts); (3) Intentional Misrepresentation (2 Counts); (4) Negligent Misrepresentation (2 Counts); and (5) Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing); Filed by Craig Gibson (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Envirotech Environmental, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONSTRUCTION CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Envirotech Environmental, Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC649031    Hearing Date: March 06, 2020    Dept: 26

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

ENVIROTECH ENVIRONMENTAL, INC.

Plaintiff,

vs.

Craig gibson, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.: BC649031

Hearing Date: March 6, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Plaintiff’s motion for enforcement of stipulation re settlement

Background

Plaintiff Envirotech Environmental Inc (“Plaintiff”) commenced this breach of contract action on February 1, 2017 against defendant Craig Gibson (“Defendant Gibson”) and Does 1 through 25. On September 8, 2017, Plaintiff filed a first amended complaint naming additional defendants Delores Marie Allen, Joel Rodney Mason, and JRM Builders & Development (“additional defendants”).

On April 3, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed these additional defendants without prejudice. On May 29, 2019, Plaintiff and these additional defendants stipulated that the dismissal be vacated and replaced with a dismissal with prejudice.

On May 30, 2019, a Stipulation Re Settlement was filed with the court. As set forth in the Stipulation, Counsel for the parties were to file dismissals of the operative complaint and cross-complaint with prejudice within seven business days, and Counsel for Envirotech was to file a release of lis pendens and the release of mechanic’s lien against Gibson’s property. Pursuant to the Stipulation, Defendant Gibson was to pay Plaintiff $15,000 over 30 monthly payments of $500 each due on the 15th of every month beginning June 15, 2019. (Stipulation Re Settlement, filed 5/30/19.)

On June 6, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed the operative complaint with prejudice. On June 18, 2019, Gibson dismissed the cross-complaint with prejudice.

On August 20, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant motion pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 to enforce the stipulation re settlement. Plaintiff’s counsel states under penalty of perjury that Plaintiff has released the lis pendens. (Koorstad Decl. ¶ 7.) However, Plaintiff has not received any payment pursuant to the stipulation re settlement from Defendant Gibson. (Skelton Decl. ¶ 2.)

Gibson has not filed any opposition.

Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6 provides, “If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.”

“Section 664.6 empowers a court to enforce a settlement agreement by way of a summary procedure if certain requirements are satisfied. In order to take advantage of the statute’s expedited procedure, a party must first establish the agreement at issue was set forth ‘in a writing signed by the parties’ (§ 664.6) or was made orally before the court.”

“‘[V]oluntary dismissal of an action or special proceeding terminates the court’s jurisdiction over the matter.’” (Mesa RHF Partners, L.P. v. City of Los Angeles (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 913, 917, [internal citation omitted].) “‘If requested by the parties,’ however, ‘the [trial] court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce [a] settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.’” (Ibid. [internal citations omitted].) “‘Because of its summary nature, strict compliance with the requirements of section 664.6 is prerequisite to invoking the power of the court to impose a settlement agreement.’” (Ibid. [internal citations omitted].)

“A request for the trial court to retain jurisdiction under section 664.6 ‘must conform to the same three requirements which the Legislature and the courts have deemed necessary for section 664.6 enforcement of the settlement itself: the request must be made (1) during the pendency of the case, not after the case has been dismissed in its entirety, (2) by the parties themselves, and (3) either in a writing signed by the parties or orally before the court.’” (Ibid. [internal citations omitted].) “The ‘request must be express, not implied from other language, and it must be clear and unambiguous.’” (Ibid. [internal citations omitted].)

Discussion

Plaintiff and Defendant Gibson entered into a written agreement pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 664.6, filed with the court on May 30, 2019, during the pendency of the case. (Koorstad Decl., Ex. 1.) Each party and their respective attorneys signed this stipulated agreement. (Ibid.) Paragraph 6 of page two of the agreement memorializes the parties’ stipulation and joint request that the Court retain jurisdiction over this settlement agreement. (Ibid.) Accordingly, the Court has the authority to enforce the settlement agreement entered into between the parties per CCP § 664.6.

The dismissal against defendant Gibson is vacated. Defendant has failed to timely pay Plaintiff the amount due under the Stipulated Settlement and therefore, is in default on the terms of the settlement agreement. Judgment is proper against Defendant Gibson in the stipulated amount of $15,000. The judgment is entered this date.

Conclusion and ORDER

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Envirotech Environmental, Inc.’s motion for enforcement of the stipulation re settlement is GRANTED. Judgment is entered for $15,000.00 against Defendant Craig Gibson.

Moving Party to give notice and file proof of service.

DATED: March 6, 2020 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court