This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2021 at 16:10:31 (UTC).

ENTEZAM, NAZANIN VS ASGARI, MOHSEN

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 ENTEZAM, NAZANIN filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against ASGARI, MOHSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0213

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ENTEZAM NAZANIN

Respondent

ASGARI MOHSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRYAN SHARON ANN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice of Firm Name Change

12/31/2020: Notice - Notice of Firm Name Change

Proof of Service of Summons

11/9/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

10/8/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child

10/8/2020: Petition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child

Summons

10/8/2020: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/8/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

10/8/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Firm Name Change ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPetition - Legal Separation w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRYAN SHARON ANN