This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2020 at 06:30:42 (UTC).

ENRIQUETA MARQUEZ, ET AL. VS HERNANDEZ JOSE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 ENRIQUETA MARQUEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HERNANDEZ JOSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2663

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARQUEZ ENRIQUETA

MARQUEZ MATTIAS

Defendants

ORTIZ JESUS I

JOSE HERNANDEZ

1-5 DOES

ELENA OCHOA

CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA ERICK

GARCIA HERNANDEZ ERICK G

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/27/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/13/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Enriqueta Marquez (Plaintiff); Mattias Marquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Enriqueta Marquez (Plaintiff); Mattias Marquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Enriqueta Marquez (Plaintiff); Mattias Marquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA HERNANDEZ ERICK G