This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 06:08:17 (UTC).

ENRIQUE MUNOZ VS SPOT INTERNATIONAL INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 ENRIQUE MUNOZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SPOT INTERNATIONAL INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4904

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNOZ ENRIQUE

Defendants

SPOT INTERNATIONAL INC.

BERNARD TARYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERKO JACK

Defendant Attorney

TURNER ANNE M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/1/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/3/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

8/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Enrique Munoz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Spot International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Spot International Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Enrique Munoz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Enrique Munoz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Enrique Munoz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Enrique Munoz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less