This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:40:20 (UTC).

ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB & LACK, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS QUINN, EMANUEL, URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB LACK, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against QUINN, EMANUEL, URQUHART SULLIVAN, LLP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0627

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK

Defendant

QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATERS GREGORY P.

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/28/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY (PLAINTIFF); HEA...)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS BY (PLAINTIFF); HEA...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ADDENDUM TO DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK'S MOTION FOR STAY FILED JULY 26, 2022

9/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ADDENDUM TO DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ENGSTROM LIPSCOMB & LACK'S MOTION FOR STAY FILED JULY 26, 2022

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLPS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

9/16/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLPS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. WHALEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART SULLIVAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/16/2022: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. WHALEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART SULLIVAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART SULLIVAN, LLPS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/16/2022: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART SULLIVAN, LLPS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLPS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

9/16/2022: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLPS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB LACKS MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

9/14/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF ENGSTROM, LIPSCOMB LACKS MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL M. SEARCY III IN SUPPORT OF QES OPPOSITION TO ELLS MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

9/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARSHALL M. SEARCY III IN SUPPORT OF QES OPPOSITION TO ELLS MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/13/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. WHALEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL G. WHALEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

9/13/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY P. WATERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QUINN, EMANUEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARING OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2022

8/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARING OF SEPTEMBER 26, 2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2022

8/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME ...)

8/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME ...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/8/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR THE HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ARBITRATION

8/5/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR THE HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ARBITRATION

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/19/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Stay of Proceedings: Filed By: Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration: Filed By: Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings By (Plaintiff); Hea...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Stay of Proceedings /By (Plaintiff) scheduled for 09/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 updated: Result Date to 09/28/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack, A Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack, A Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Engstrom, Lipscomb & Lack, A Professional Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less