This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 11:10:10 (UTC).

ENELI MAAFUI TAUTEOLI, ET AL. VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 ENELI MAAFUI TAUTEOLI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0102

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAUTEOLI ENELI MAAFUI

LOTULELEI KIOLANI ELENOA

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2021

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/10/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

8/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/27/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

8/18/2020: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

8/10/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/11/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eneli Maafui Tauteoli (Plaintiff); Kiolani Elenoa Lotulelei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 1:36 PM in Department 57; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Eneli Maafui Tauteoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eneli Maafui Tauteoli (Plaintiff); Kiolani Elenoa Lotulelei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eneli Maafui Tauteoli (Plaintiff); Kiolani Elenoa Lotulelei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eneli Maafui Tauteoli (Plaintiff); Kiolani Elenoa Lotulelei (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O