Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2020 at 14:40:08 (UTC).

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. VS JMI SANITATION SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JMI SANITATION SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1715

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES

STARR SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

JMI SANITATION SERVICES INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAHEY ERIN M

LAHEY ERIN M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BAZAZ GINA

KAHN JAMES NELSON

 

Court Documents

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

11/5/2020: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Case Management Statement

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO ORDER MADE 7/23/2020 I...)

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO ORDER MADE 7/23/2020 I...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/19/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Related Case

4/6/2020: Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint

4/6/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

4/6/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

3/24/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

3/24/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Pursuant to order made 7/23/2020 in Notice of Related case m.o. 19STCV11578) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference Pursuant to order made 7/23/2020 i...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by JMI Sanitation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JMI Sanitation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by JMI Sanitation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JMI Sanitation Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Chubb Group of Insurance Companies (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMI SANITATION SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where STARR SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant