This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 22:05:15 (UTC).

ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY, LLC VS HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, ELAINE LU and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3693

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

ELAINE LU

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY LLC

Defendants

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

KRISTIN C. CUMMINGS

SETH V. JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKSON KIRSTEN C.

KARNAZE ANNA NICOLE

PACINI STEVEN J

GILBERT ROBERT JAMES

DAVISON JOSEPH D.

BISHOP DORN GRAHAM

Defendant Attorneys

SULLIVAN SUSAN REBECCA

BECKLEY JULIA

CUMMINGS KRISTIN C.

DODGE JR. G. RICHARD

JACKSON SETH V.

MOSKOWITZ M. KEITH

BRADHAM ERIN E.

D?ANTONIO THOMAS J.

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

6/15/2022: RETURNED MAIL

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING APPEARANCE

6/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING APPEARANCE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE LAWANNA WALTERS CORSON, CSR #7135

6/13/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE LAWANNA WALTERS CORSON, CSR #7135

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S APRIL 4,...)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S APRIL 4,...)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE COURTS APRIL 4, 2022 ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

6/6/2022: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE COURTS APRIL 4, 2022 ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO COORDINATE HEARING DATES

6/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO COORDINATE HEARING DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

6/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE

5/31/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE COURT'S APRIL 4, 2022 ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

5/31/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE COURT'S APRIL 4, 2022 ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SIGNING OF JUDGMENT)

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE COURTS SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

5/20/2022: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE COURTS SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE COURTS SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

5/20/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO THE COURTS SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/20/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO THE COURT'S SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

5/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO THE COURT'S SUA SPONTE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

9/8/2021: Notice of Appearance

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Hearing10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (of the Court's April 4, 2022 order) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (PLAINTIFF ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY, LLC?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. 657;) - Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 26; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Clerical Error

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (LaWanna Walters Corson, CSR #7135)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 4,...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Hearing Appearance); Filed by Endeavor Operating Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF REMOTE APPEARANCE); Filed by Ace American Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:28 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 08/02/2021, Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Notice - First Amended General Order in Re LASC Mandatory Electronic Filing for Civil - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipul...); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:28 AM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination) of 07/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Endeavor Operating Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Endeavor Operating Company, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******3693 Hearing Date: October 27, 2021 Dept: 26

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

endeavor operating company, llc, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: *******3693

Hearing Date: October 27, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING steven j. pacini and anna nicole karnaze AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Steven J. Pacini (“Pacini”) and Anna Nicole Karnaze (“Karnaze”) apply as counsel pro hac vice for Plaintiff Endeavor Operating Company. The applications are unopposed.

Under CRC Rule 9.40, attorneys licensed and in good standing in other states may, upon the California court’s approval, appear as counsel pro hac vice in a pending case if an active member of the state bar is associated as attorney of record. (CRC 9.40(a).) Pacini is an active member, in good standing, of the Bar of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, and the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, (Pacini Decl. ¶¶ 3-5.) In addition, Pacini states that he is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Cotuit, Massachusetts with an office in Boston, Massachusetts. (Pacini Decl. ¶¶ 1-2, 7.) Pacini states states that he has not applied to appear as counsel pro hac vice in the last two years. (Pacini Decl. ¶ 6.)

Karnaze is an active member, in good standing, of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, and the State of New York. (Karnaze Decl. ¶¶ 3-5.) In addition, Karnaze states that she is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Chicago, Illinoiswith an office in Boston, Massachusetts. (Karnaze Decl. ¶¶ 1-2, 7.) Karnaze states that she has not applied to appear as counsel pro hac vice in the last two years. (Karnaze Decl. ¶ 6.) Thus, Counsels satisfy the eligibility requirements of CRC 9.40(a).

Pacini’ and Karnaze’s applications successfully address all six content requirements outlined in CRC 9.40(d). Specifically, Pacini and Karnaze provides in their respective applications: (1) their residence and office address (Pacini Decl. ¶¶ 1-2; Karnaze Decl. ¶¶ 1-2); (2) the courts to which each Counsel has been admitted to practice and the dates of admission (Pacini Decl. ¶ 3-4; Karnaze Decl. ¶ 3-4); (3) that they are a member in good standing in those courts (Pacini Decl. ¶ 5; Karnaze Decl. ¶ 5); (4) that they are not currently suspended or disbarred in any court (Pacini Decl. ¶ 5; Karnaze Decl. ¶ 5); (5) the title of each court and cause in which the applicant has filed an application to appear as counsel pro hac vice in this state in the preceding two years, the date of each application, and whether or not it was granted (Pacini Decl. ¶ 6; Karnaze Decl. ¶ 6); and (6) the name, address, and telephone number of an active members, Robert J. Gilbert, David A. Barrett, Kirsten C. Jackson, and Dorn G. Bishop, of the State Bar of California who is the current counsel of record for Plaintiff Endeavor Operating Company (Pacini Decl. ¶ 8; Karnaze Decl. ¶ 8).

Furthermore, Pacini and Karnaze provide the declaration of Robert J. Gilbert, demonstrating that they both meet the requirement of CRC 9.40(c)(1). That rule provides: “a person desiring to appear as counsel pro hac vice in a superior court must file with the court a verified application together with proof of service . . . of a copy of the application and of the notice on all parties who have appeared in the cause and on the State Bar of California at its San Francisco office.” (Gilbert Decl. ¶ 3.)

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The applications of Steven J. Pacini and Anna Nicole Karnaze to appear as counsel pro hac vice for Plaintiff Endeavor Operating Company are GRANTED.

The Moving Parties are ordered to provide notice of this order and file a proof of service of such.

DATED: October 27, 2021 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court

________________________________________________________________________________________________________

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

endeavor operating company, llc, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: *******3693

Hearing Date: October 27, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING Kristin C. Cumming and Seth v. Jackson AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Kristin C. Cummings (“Cummings”) and Seth V. Jackson (“Jackson”) apply as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company. The applications are unopposed.

Under CRC Rule 9.40, attorneys licensed and in good standing in other states may, upon the California court’s approval, appear as counsel pro hac vice in a pending case if an active member of the state bar is associated as attorney of record. (CRC 9.40(a).) Cummings is an active member, in good standing, of the United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas, the United States District Court, Northern District of Texas, the United States District Court, Southern District of Texas, the United States District Court, Western District of Texas, the United States District Court, Western District of Oklahoma, the United States District Court, District of Colorado, and the Supreme Court of Texas. (Cummings Decl. ¶¶ 6-8.) In addition, Cummings states that she is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Coppell, Texas with an office in Dallas Texas. (Cummings Decl. ¶¶ 2-5.) Cummings states that she has previously applied as counsel pro hac vice in five action in the past two years and was approved in each. (Cummings Decl. ¶ 9.)

Jackson is an active member, in good standing, of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, and the State of New York. (Jackson Decl. ¶¶ 6-8.) In addition, Jackson states that he is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Franklin, Massachusetts with an office in Framingham, Massachusetts. (Jackson Decl. ¶¶ 2-5.) Jackson states that he has not applied to appear as counsel pro hac vice in the last two years. (Jackson Decl. ¶ 9.) Thus, Counsels satisfy the eligibility requirements of CRC 9.40(a).

Cummings’ and Jackson’s applications successfully address all six content requirements outlined in CRC 9.40(d). Specifically, Cummings and Jackson provides in their respective applications: (1) their residence and office address (Cummings Decl. ¶¶ 4-5; Jackson Decl. ¶¶ 4-5); (2) the courts to which each Counsel has been admitted to practice and the dates of admission (Cummings Decl. ¶ 7; Jackson Decl. ¶ 7); (3) that they are a member in good standing in those courts (Cummings Decl. ¶ 6; Jackson Decl. ¶ 6); (4) that they are not currently suspended or disbarred in any court (Cummings Decl. ¶ 8; Jackson Decl. ¶ 8); (5) the title of each court and cause in which the applicant has filed an application to appear as counsel pro hac vice in this state in the preceding two years, the date of each application, and whether or not it was granted (Cummings Decl. ¶ 9; Jackson Decl. ¶ 9); and (6) the name, address, and telephone number of an active member, Thomas J. D’Antonio, of the State Bar of California who is the current counsel of record for Defendant HDI Global Insurance Company (Cummings Decl. ¶ 10; Jackson Decl. ¶ 10).

Furthermore, Cummings and Jackson provide proof of service, demonstrating that they both meet the requirement of CRC 9.40(c)(1). That rule provides: “a person desiring to appear as counsel pro hac vice in a superior court must file with the court a verified application together with proof of service . . . of a copy of the application and of the notice on all parties who have appeared in the cause and on the State Bar of California at its San Francisco office.” (Cummings Decl., Ex. A; Jackson Decl., Ex. A.)

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The applications of Kristin C. Cummings and Seth V. Jackson to appear as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant HDI Specialty Insurance Company are GRANTED.

The Moving Parties are ordered to provide notice of this order and file a proof of service of such.

DATED: October 27, 2021 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court

__________________________________________________________________________________________________________

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

endeavor operating company, llc, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: *******3693

Hearing Date: October 27, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING g. Richard dodge, jr., erin r. bradham, and m. keith moskowitz AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

G. Richard Dodge, Jr. (“Dodge”), Erin E. Bradham (“Bradham”), and M. Kaith Moskowitz (“Moskowitz”) apply as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant AIG Specialty Insurance Company. The applications are unopposed.

Under CRC Rule 9.40, attorneys licensed and in good standing in other states may, upon the California court’s approval, appear as counsel pro hac vice in a pending case if an active member of the state bar is associated as attorney of record. (CRC 9.40(a).) Dodge is an active member, in good standing, of the State Bar for District of Columbia, State Bar for New York, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, and U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia. (Dodge Decl. ¶¶ 6-8.) In addition, Dodge states that he is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Washington D.C. with an office in Washington D.C. (Dodge Decl. ¶¶ 2-5.) Dodge states that he previously applied as counsel pro hac vice in California for General Star Idemnity Company, et al. v. JRK Property Holdings, Inc. in the United States District Court, Central District of California on July 6, 2021 and was approved. (Dodge Decl. ¶ 9.)

Bradham is an active member, in good standing, of the State Bar of Arizona, the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, and the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. (Bradham Decl. ¶¶ 6-8.) In addition, Bradham states that she is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Phoenix, Arizona with an office in Phoenix, Arizona. (Bradham Decl. ¶¶ 2-5.) Bradham states that she has previously applied as counsel pro hac vice in four action in the past two years and was approved in each. (Bradham Decl. ¶ 9.)

Moskowitz is an active member, in good standing, of the State Bar of Connecticut, the State Bar of New York, the State Bar of Illinois, the US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois, the US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, the US District Court for the Central District of Illinois, and the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. (Moskowitz Decl. ¶¶ 6-8.) In addition, Moskowitz states that he is not a resident of California or regularly engaged in business in Califonia and is a resident of Chicago, Illinois with an office in Chicago, Illinois. (Moskowitz Decl. ¶¶ 2-5.) Moskowitz states that he has previously applied as counsel pro hac vice in five actions in the past two years and was approved in each. (Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 9.) Thus, Counsels satisfy the eligibility requirements of CRC 9.40(a).

Dodge’s, Bradham’s, and Moskowitz’s applications successfully address all six content requirements outlined in CRC 9.40(d). Specifically, Dodge, Bradhamn, and Moskowitz provides in their respective applications: (1) their residence and office address (Dodge Decl. ¶¶ 4-5; Bradham Decl. ¶¶ 4-5; Moskowitz Decl. ¶¶ 4-5); (2) the courts to which each Counsel has been admitted to practice and the dates of admission (Dodge Decl. ¶ 7; Bradham Decl. ¶ 7; Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 7); (3) that they are a member in good standing in those courts (Dodge Decl. ¶ 6; Bradham Decl. ¶ 6; Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 6); (4) that they are not currently suspended or disbarred in any court (Dodge Decl. ¶ 8; Bradham Decl. ¶ 8; Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 8); (5) the title of each court and cause in which the applicant has filed an application to appear as counsel pro hac vice in this state in the preceding two years, the date of each application, and whether or not it was granted (Dodge Decl. ¶ 9; Bradham Decl. ¶ 9; Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 9); and (6) the name, address, and telephone number of an active member, Julia M. Beckley, of the State Bar of California who is the current counsel of record for Defendant AIG Specialty Insurance Company (Dodge Decl. ¶ 10; Bradham Decl. ¶ 10; Moskowitz Decl. ¶ 10).

Furthermore, Dodge, Bradham, and Moskowitz provide proof of service, demonstrating that they both meet the requirement of CRC 9.40(c)(1). That rule provides: “a person desiring to appear as counsel pro hac vice in a superior court must file with the court a verified application together with proof of service . . . of a copy of the application and of the notice on all parties who have appeared in the cause and on the State Bar of California at its San Francisco office.”

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The applications of G. Richard Dodge, Jr., Erin E. Bradham, and M. Kaith Moskowitz to appear as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant AIG Specialty Insurance Company are GRANTED.

The Moving Parties are ordered to provide notice of this order and file a proof of service of such.

DATED: October 27, 2021 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court

'