This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/09/2022 at 07:29:15 (UTC).

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT VS FAHRINGER, RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against FAHRINGER, RAYMOND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Respondent

FAHRINGER RAYMOND

Others

CARRUTHERS KATRINA

BABB GALEN

CARRUTHERS KATRENA

CHAVEZ ROBERT

CORNEJO NORMA

CORTEZ CARLA

FREEMAN LESLIE

GAVADIA IVAN

GOMEZ KEN

GRAY MARK

LANE THOAMS

LOYA ADAM

MCCARTER AARON

MCKINNEY CATHY

MEDINA JOSE

MORAN ELDA

PECOT MONICA

PEREZ JORGE

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

PARR BRADLEY WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Miscellaneous

1/14/2022: Miscellaneous

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/13/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

1/13/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/13/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

2/3/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

2/3/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Personal Service-(Forms WV-109, WV-110, WV-100)

2/3/2022: Proof of Service - Personal Service-(Forms WV-109, WV-110, WV-100)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

1/11/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

1/11/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

1/11/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service -WV130 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal Service-(Forms WV-109, WV-110, WV-100) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Employee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARR BRADLEY W.