This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 00:27:44 (UTC).

EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY VS HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6119

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMPLOYERS PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

HOLLYWOOD INTERNATIONAL REGIONAL CENTER LLC

RELEVANT HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

3/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/10/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/10/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

3/10/2023: Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 03/14/2023

3/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 03/14/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

3/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Advancing and Vacating the Case Management Confer...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Advancing and Vacating the Case Management Confer...) of 03/14/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood International Regional Center LLC (Defendant); Relevant Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood International Regional Center LLC (Defendant); Relevant Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Hollywood International Regional Center LLC; Relevant Hospitality LLC; On the Complaint filed by Employers Preferred Insurance Company on 11/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 03/10/2023 entered for Plaintiff Employers Preferred Insurance Company against Defendant Hollywood International Regional Center LLC; Defendant Relevant Hospitality LLC. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood International Regional Center LLC (Defendant); Relevant Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood International Regional Center LLC (Defendant); Relevant Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Employers Preferred Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hollywood International Regional Center LLC (Defendant); Relevant Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less