This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 10:00:10 (UTC).

EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1519

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Respondent

EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Appellants

DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE

ROUILLARD MICHELLE `

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

MCCLELLAND MICHAEL DYLAN

JUNG CURTIS CHUEY

JUNG CURTIS C.

Defendant Attorneys

CONKLIN MARY R

ATASHKAR BEJAN EYRE

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/14/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 21, 2021 HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.S DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND TRIAL SET

1/15/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE JANUARY 21, 2021 HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC.S DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND TRIAL SET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARINGS FOR (I) MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND (II) TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

4/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARINGS FOR (I) MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND (II) TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARINGS)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE HEARING FOR THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. O

4/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE HEARING FOR THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. O

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B301188

5/19/2021: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B301188

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 09/19/19 B301188

5/19/2021: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 09/19/19 B301188

Substitution of Attorney

5/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

5/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund / Order

12/18/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $3,660.00; MEMORANDU

12/3/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $3,660.00; MEMORANDU

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEJAN ATASHKAR

12/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEJAN ATASHKAR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE

12/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER LEE

Request for Judicial Notice

12/3/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

12/3/2020: Separate Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 09/19/19 B301188); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B301188); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE RE HEARING FOR THE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE); Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deft. Department of Managed Health Care's Further Responses to Pltfs Requests for Production of Documents, Set No. One) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Deft. Michelle Rouillard's Further Responses to Pltfs Requests for Production of Documents, Set No. One) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mary Conklin); Filed by DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketMotion re: (Motion to Strike CCP 425.16); Filed by DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYEE HEALTH SYSTEMS MEDICAL GROUP INC . is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATASHKAR BEJAN E ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONKLIN MARY R