This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2018 at 19:41:20 (UTC).

EMPIRE CONTR FREIGHT STA INC VS. QUALITY SVC. TRUCKING INC.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 EMPIRE CONTR FREIGHT STA INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against QUALITY SVC TRUCKING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9282

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC.

Defendant

QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

ONYEMENAM AWELE FRANCES

 

Court Documents

Request

9/17/2018: Request

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/12/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/11/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/11/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Summons

9/10/2018: Summons

Notice of Trial

10/2/2018: Notice of Trial

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/25/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request

9/25/2018: Request

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension) (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed against Attorney Awele F. Onyemenam) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Docketat 10:32 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Awele Frances Onyemenam (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ONYEMENAM AWELE FRANCES