This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:44:41 (UTC).

EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC VS QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3105

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC

Defendant

QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/30/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/15/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order - Dismissal

2/26/2019: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

2/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

2/26/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 02/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Empire Container Freight Station, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Empire Container Freight Station, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY SERVICE TRUCKING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE CONTAINER FREIGHT STATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASTROIANNI A. DOUGLAS ESQ.