This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 18:37:51 (UTC).

EMMANUEL SADORRA VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 EMMANUEL SADORRA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5539

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADORRA EMMANUEL

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SCHMIDT CHRISTINA PATRIZIA

Other Attorneys

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/11/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2024
  • Hearing02/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Emmanuel Sadorra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emmanuel Sadorra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Emmanuel Sadorra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emmanuel Sadorra (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE