This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 19:16:26 (UTC).

EMMA UCHTMAN ET AL VS JOSE GABRIEL PADILLA SANTANA ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 EMMA UCHTMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE GABRIEL PADILLA SANTANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9709

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

UCHTMAN WILLIAM EVAN

UCHTMAN EMMA

Respondents, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MURADYAN VARUZH

SANTANA JOSE GABRIEL PADILLA

RILEY JAMES P.

NELSON CONSTANCE

DOES 1 TO 20

CENTURY CONSTRUCTION WEST INC.

LETTER BLUE PRODUCTION

KNOX DAVID

RILEY JAMES P

KOX DAVID

KAZARYAN DOE 1 ANAIT

MENDOZA OSCAR RUBEN

SUNBELT RENTAL INC.

CENTURY CONSTRUCTION WEST INC. DBA SAVECAL

ACCREDITED SURETY CASUALTY COMPANY INC.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LAW GROUP

REGHABI KHOSRO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EDIC WILLIAM S

MEISLIN JONATHAN E.

VO MICHELLE N

REDFIELD RYAN P.

Cross Defendant Attorney

HANCOCK ESQ MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING MOTIONS TO COMPEL

6/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWING MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Answer

3/3/2021: Answer

Answer

3/3/2021: Answer

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/24/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 01/28/2021

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 01/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/3/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/14/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

8/29/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • Hearing11/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Hearing11/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against Plaintiff's Counsel, Khosro Reghabi, in an amount up to $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Hearing08/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS BY EMMA UCHTMAN AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $912.00;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWING MOTIONS TO COMPEL); Filed by Sunbelt Rental, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Century Construction West, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by Century Construction West, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 2:48 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Dark Court and Rescheduling Motion Hearings.) of 05/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Emma Uchtman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Emma Uchtman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Khosro Reghabi (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Constance Nelson (Defendant); James P. Riley (Defendant); David Kox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Constance Nelson (Defendant); James P. Riley (Defendant); David Kox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Emma Uchtman (Plaintiff); William Evan Uchtman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emma Uchtman (Plaintiff); William Evan Uchtman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURY CONSTRUCTION WEST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNBELT RENTALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Accredited Surety and Casualty Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VO MICHELLE N.