This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2022 at 18:27:56 (UTC).

EMIN KHACHATRYAN, ET AL. VS ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 EMIN KHACHATRYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0247

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KHACHATRYAN EMIN

MELIKYAN SARAYI

Defendant

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MGDESYAN GEORGE GEVORK

MGDESYAN GEORGE G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/25/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/25/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emin Khachatryan (Plaintiff); Sarayi Melikyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emin Khachatryan (Plaintiff); Sarayi Melikyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Emin Khachatryan (Plaintiff); Sarayi Melikyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MGDESYAN GEORGE G. ESQ.