Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 00:20:13 (UTC).

EMILY SANCHEZ VS BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 EMILY SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5514

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ EMILY

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRONCOSO TOMMY M

Defendant Attorneys

ARNOLD COURTNEY

MAVIAN SUSAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

7/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/17/2020

7/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/17/2020

Substitution of Attorney

6/18/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

4/10/2019: Answer

Answer

3/20/2019: Answer

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/22/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/19/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Hearing09/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 07/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Best Friends Animal Society (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Emily Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Emily Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emily Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emily Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST FRIENDS ANIMAL SOCIETY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRONCOSO TOMMY M.