This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 02:00:32 (UTC).

EMILY LOPEZ VS AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 EMILY LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9525

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ EMILY

Defendant

AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMENDT CHRISTIAN J

Defendant Attorney

STOCKALPER PATRICK E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/6/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

10/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/15/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/15/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/19/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/5/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Attorney); Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Azusa Pacific University (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emily Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOCKALPER PATRICK E. ESQ