This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2023 at 05:57:55 (UTC).

EMILY GUTIERREZ, ET AL. VS CBS BROADCASTING INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 EMILY GUTIERREZ, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CBS BROADCASTING INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3291

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUTIERREZ EMILY

LIBERTI JOHN A.

Defendants

CBS BROADCASTING INC.

COLUMBIA PICTURES INDUSTRIES INC.

DICK CLARK TELESHOW INC.

FILMATION ASSOCIATES

ICON PRODUCTIONS INC.

LORIMAR PRODUCTIONS INC.

METRO-GOLDWYN-MAYER STUDIOS INC.

NATIONAL BROADCASTING CO. INC.

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC

PARAMOUNT PICTURES CORPORATION

PEOPLE'S CHOICE AWARDS INC.

SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT INC.

SONY PICTURES TELEVISION INC.

TALENT & RESIDUALS INC.

TURNER ENTERTAINMENT FILM CO.

TWENTIETH CENTURY FOX FILM CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS INC.

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUCU REBECCA ANN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

10/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DIMITRI NICHOLS DECLARATION REGARDING FEBRUARY 23, 2022 ORDER APPOINTING EMILY GUTIERREZ SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

10/11/2022: Declaration - DIMITRI NICHOLS DECLARATION REGARDING FEBRUARY 23, 2022 ORDER APPOINTING EMILY GUTIERREZ SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

Complaint

10/11/2022: Complaint

Affidavit - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

10/11/2022: Affidavit - PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Emily Gutierrez, et al. on 10/11/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Emily Gutierrez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: As To Parties changed from Universal Television LLC (Defendant), Universal Ty Sys, Inc. (Defendant), Icon Productions, Inc. (Defendant), Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant), Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation (Defendant), NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant), Filmation Associates (Defendant), Universal City Studios, Inc. (Defendant), Paramount Pictures Corporation (Defendant), Talent & Residuals, Inc. (Defendant), National Broadcasting Co. Inc. (Defendant), People's Choice Awards, Inc. (Defendant), Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (Defendant), Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant), Universal City Studios LLC (Defendant), Lorimar Productions, Inc. (Defendant), Sony Pictures Television Inc. (Defendant), Warner Communications LLC (Defendant), CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant), Turner Entertainment Film Co. (Defendant), Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios Inc. (Defendant), Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. (Defendant) to Turner Entertainment Fi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDimitri Nichols Declaration Regarding February 23, 2022 Order Appointing Emily Gutierrez Special Administrator; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Emily Gutierrez (Plaintiff); John A. Liberti (Plaintiff); As to: CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Defendant); Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Dick Clark Teleshow Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less