This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:07:01 (UTC).

EMILY ELSON ET AL VS ASHLEY BLACK ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 EMILY ELSON filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ASHLEY BLACK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0843

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OAKES LORETTA

DORENKAMP TILLY

HAAVISTO STACY

LEFEBVRE JULIA

LANUM MICHELLE

ELSON EMILY

GRLICKY SUE

GAINES JERRY

SALAS DINA

RODRIGUEZ ARLENE

Defendants and Respondents

BLACK ASHLEY

ASHLEY DIANA BLACK INTERNATIONAL

ABD INTERESTS LLC

DOES 1-100

ADB INTERESTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DISNER PERRIN F.

Defendant Attorney

HERZFELD & RUBIN LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice

1/5/2018: Notice

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FALSE ADVERTISING (CAL. CIV. CODE SECTION 1770), ETC

10/23/2017: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FALSE ADVERTISING (CAL. CIV. CODE SECTION 1770), ETC

Other -

12/13/2017: Other -

Minute Order

1/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

Notice

1/5/2018: Notice

SUMMONS

10/23/2017: SUMMONS

Order

11/1/2017: Order

Response

1/8/2018: Response

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/8/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 311; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • at 2:00 PM in Department 311; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Response -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION RESPONSE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by EMILY ELSON (Plaintiff); STACY HAAVISTO (Plaintiff); LORETTA OAKES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice -NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice -NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice; Filed by ADB INTERESTS LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by ADB INTERESTS LLC, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by EMILY ELSON (Plaintiff); STACY HAAVISTO (Plaintiff); LORETTA OAKES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • -PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by EMILY ELSON (Plaintiff); STACY HAAVISTO (Plaintiff); LORETTA OAKES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Order -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FALSE ADVERTISING (CAL. CIV. CODE SECTION 1770), ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by EMILY ELSON (Plaintiff); STACY HAAVISTO (Plaintiff); LORETTA OAKES (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.